Morton, Grazyna (CPSO#: 55974)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: Jakubaszek-Morton, Grazyna (used until: 08 Apr 1997 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Lublin, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mood Disorder Program
Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6512
Fax: (613) 761-3602
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRAZYNA MORTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2000