Morton, Thomas John (CPSO#: 67051)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Aug 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: 905-721-4322
Fax: 905-721-6698
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Thomas Morton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Morton ( CPSO# 67051 )

Business Address:
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 723-8551

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 24 Aug 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS JOHN MORTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1997