Morzaria, Rasiklal Narshidas (CPSO#: 27136)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 11 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Sep 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bristol, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rasiklal Morzaria Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Morzaria ( CPSO# 27136 )

Business Address:
Suite 204
1920 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 289-1999

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2014
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 11 Sep 2017

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 11 Sep 2017
Summary:

On September 11, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Rasiklal Narshidas Morzaria 
committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has engaged in the sexual abuse of a 
patient and in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members 
as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
Sexual Abuse of Patient A during Regular Office Appointments 
 
Dr. Morzaria treated Patient A from the time Patient A was six years old until he was twelve. 
 
When Patient A and his mother attended at Dr. Morzaria’s office for appointments, Dr. Morzaria 
would often ask Patient A’s mother to wait outside the examination room, claiming that Patient 
A was old enough to be seen alone. When alone with Patient A, Dr. Morzaria touched, 
rubbed/stroked and played with Patient A’s penis. Dr. Morzaria would ask Patient A if it felt 
good, and tell him to come visit him on week-ends. When Patient A’s mother was in the room, 
Dr. Morzaria would usually just check Patient A’s genitals to follow up on a prior medical 
procedure. 
 
At one appointment, while Patient A’s mother was outside the examination room, Dr. Morzaria 
took his penis out of his pants and asked Patient A to suck it. Patient A refused, but was scared. 
Dr. Morzaria told Patient A he was an undercover cop and that if he told anyone what was 
happening, he and his family would spend the rest of their lives in jail, which made Patient A 
afraid to tell his parents. 
 
Sexual Abuse of Patient A during Weekend Visits to Dr. Morzaria’s Office 
 
Dr. Morzaria would sometimes pick Patient A up at his home and drive him to the office on the 
weekends, when there were no staff members present. To arrange these visits, Dr. Morzaria 
would call the family home and speak to Patient A and his mother. Patient A’s mother agreed to 
these outings, which Dr. Morzaria had offered on his own initiative, as Dr. Morzaria was a 
doctor and she trusted him. Patient A felt he had to go, because he believed Dr. Morzaria was an 
undercover cop.  
 
During one weekend visit, Dr. Morzaria showed Patient A a magazine or a book with pictures of 
private parts and stroke Patient A’s thigh. On other occasions, Dr. Morzaria made Patient A sit 
on his lap, and once, while Patient A was on his lap, he asked Patient A for a kiss. Patient A felt 
like he had no choice when Dr. Morzaria made him sit on his lap. 
 
At one week-end visit, when Patient A’s sibling was with him, Dr. Morzaria grabbed Patient A 
by his arm and tried to take him into another room. Dr. Morzaria did not let Patient A go until 
Patient A said he would scream. At another appointment, Patient A cried, and Dr. Morzaria took 
him home. 
 
On the way to his office on weekend visits, Dr. Morzaria took Patient A to the drive-through at 
Burger King and bought him food. He told Patient A to keep his head down, and to say that he 
was Dr. Morzaria’s grandson if asked. Dr. Morzaria promised Patient A a laptop and computer 
games for visiting him, and later gave Patient A and his family a computer and a laptop.  
 
Patient A’s Disclosure of the Abuse 
 
At his last appointment, Patient A refused to allow Dr. Morzaria to examine him below the waist. 
After this appointment, Patient A’s mother became suspicious and asked Patient A repeatedly 
about why he seemed to be acting differently with Dr. Morzaria. Shortly thereafter, Patient A 
disclosed to his mother that Dr. Morzaria had sexually abused him. Patient A and his mother 
terminated the doctor-patient relationship with Dr. Morzaria. 
 
Dr. Morzaria’s Interference with Police Investigation 
 
Dr. Morzaria called Patient A’s house after the matter was reported to the police, and tried to 
dissuade Patient A’s mother from pursuing her complaint with threats of publicity for her family. 
 
On September 11, 2017, the Committee ordered and directed on the matter of penalty and costs 
that: 
-  the Registrar revoke Dr. Morzaria’s certificate of registration effective immediately.  
-  Dr. Morzaria reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program 
   required under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or other 
   security acceptable to the College, in the amount of $16,060.00, within thirty (30) days of the 
   date of this Order.  
-  Dr. Morzaria appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-  Dr. Morzaria pay costs to the College in the amount of $27,500.00, within thirty (30) days of 
   the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): September 11, 2017