Morzycki, Wojciech (CPSO#: 73960)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: German, Polish

Education:Pomeranian Academy of Medicine, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 2001