Mosalli, Rafat Mohammed Abdulhai (CPSO#: 75455)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 06 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 07 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 06 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 07 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 15 Feb 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Critical Care

McMaster University, 15 Feb 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007