Mosawe, Mothafar Ahmed (CPSO#: 65866)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Mosul, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
medicine cabinet
port aux basques NL  A0M 1C0
Phone: (709) 695-7137

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOTHAFAR AHMED MOSAWE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOSAWE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2014