Mosely, Mfed (CPSO#: 80410)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Damascus, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Mosely Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 15 2007

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 15 May 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2004
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2007