Moser, Andrea Luva (CPSO#: 63550)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Apr 1993

Summary

Former Names: McCluskey, Andrea Luva (used until: 22 Dec 1998 )     McCluskey, Andrea Luva (used until: 08 Jun 1994 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
co Baycrest Centre for
Geriatric Care
3560 Bathurst Street
Room 1C26
North York ON  M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500 Ext. 3499
Fax: (416) 785-2409
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA LUVA MOSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOSER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1993