Mosewich, Russell Keith (CPSO#: 61323)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 22 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 1994