Moshkin, Olga Mikhailovna (CPSO#: 86990)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Stavropol State Medical Academy, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Laboratory Medicine
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121 Ext. 3108
Fax: (705) 876-5008
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Olga Moshkin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Moshkin ( CPSO# 86990 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Anatomical Pathology
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLGA MIKHAILOVNA MOSHKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOSHKIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009