Moskalyk, Tara Marie (CPSO#: 73954)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 4
2120 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone: (705) 522-0006
Fax: (705) 522-0018
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. M. Moskalyk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Moskalyk ( CPSO# 73954 )

Business Address:
4 - 2120 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone Number: (705) 522-0006

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Zealand

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TARA MARIE MOSKALYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOSKALYK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 2005