Moskovitz, Gary George (CPSO#: 56846)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 01 Oct 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Oct 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1987
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Oct 2001