Mosli, Hala Hisham (CPSO#: 82143)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2005 to 15 Feb 2005
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2006 to 28 Feb 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2007 to 28 Feb 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Feb 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2011