Moss, Jay Jeffrey Howard (CPSO#: 51256)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Nov 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
Department Of Psychiatry
Room FG 05
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4216
Fax: (416) 480-4613
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jay Moss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Moss ( CPSO# 51256 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
Department of Psychiatry
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite FG52
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4216

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAY JEFFREY HOWARD MOSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOSS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1983