Moss, Miriam Ann (CPSO#: 61215)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
2330 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1T 0A2
Phone: (416) 298-1303
Fax: (416) 298-4872
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIRIAM ANN MOSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOSS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2013