Mosskin, Mikael Wladimirovity (CPSO#: 69681)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 16 Oct 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Oct 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Karolinska Medico-Kirurgiska Institute, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Feb 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 16 Oct 1997
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Dec 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 1997