Mossman, Kerstin (CPSO#: 77615)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: Trulsen, Kerstin (used until: 14 Nov 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Eagle Ridge Professional Complex
490 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone: (705) 734-9690
Fax: (705) 503-5982
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

11 Lakeside Terrace
Suite 401
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Canada
Phone: (705) 725-9529
Fax: (705) 737-3885
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KERSTIN MOSSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOSSMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 2005