Mota, Jorge Antonio Rocha (CPSO#: 77221)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Apr 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Bahia, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesiology
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519) 271-2120 Ext. 2510
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mota Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mota ( CPSO# 77221 )

Business Address:
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 14 Dec 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 28 Sep 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 29 Sep 2003 to 29 Mar 2004
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Mar 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 26 Mar 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Sep 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Mar 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Apr 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jun 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 08 Apr 2010 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.   Jorge   Antonio   Rocha  Mota  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            Anaesthesiology, only.