Motamedi, Bijan (CPSO#: 74066)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Persian, Spanish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2012