Motayne, Gregory George (CPSO#: 51258)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Feb 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Court And Sexual
Behaviours Clinic-Forensic Services
Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6400
Fax: (613) 724-6554
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group,Brockville Mental Health Centre Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY GEORGE MOTAYNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOTAYNE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 07 Jan 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1990
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1991