Mothafar, Fatma J M A (CPSO#: 76907)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 22 Jul 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 22 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 23 Jul 2002 to 22 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 23 Jul 2003 to 22 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 23 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 23 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008