Motlagh, Bahareh (CPSO#: 80692)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Mar 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3601 Hwy 7 East, Suite 203
Markham ON  L3R 0M3
Phone: (905) 604-6227
Fax: (905) 604-6442
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bahareh Motlagh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Motlagh ( CPSO# 80692 )

Business Address:
203 - 3601 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3R 0M3
Phone Number: (905) 604-6227

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 21 Jan 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BAHAREH MOTLAGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOTLAGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 22 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 25 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2009