Mott, Brian Douglas (CPSO#: 73229)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 20 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Aug 2001
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 May 2005