Mottahedi, Roksana (CPSO#: 84543)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Mar 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Kanata ON  K2M 1P6
Phone: (613) 599-3321
Fax: (613) 599-3366
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Mar 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROKSANA MOTTAHEDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOTTAHEDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 14 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 08 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2010