Motz, Catherine Marie (CPSO#: 68232)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210
308 Palladium Drive
Kanata ON  K2V 1A1
Phone: (613) 599-3422
Fax: 613-599-6922
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Motz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Motz ( CPSO# 68232 )

Business Address:
Suite 210
308 Palladium Drive
Kanata ON  K2V 1A1
Phone Number: (613) 599-3422

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE MARIE MOTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOTZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1996