Moulaison, William Gerard (CPSO#: 59816)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 29 Nov 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Nov 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jul 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 29 Nov 1996