Moulin, Dwight Emmerson (CPSO#: 26896)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Sep 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Regional Cancer Program
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (519) 685-8661
Fax: (519) 685-8636
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8636
Fax: (519) 685-8636
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moulin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Moulin ( CPSO# 26896 )

Business Address:
London Regional Cancer Centre
790 Commissioners Road East
Suite A1-146
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8661

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 07 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DWIGHT EMMERSON MOULIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOULIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1985