Moulton, Carol-Anne Evelyn (CPSO#: 79865)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 31 Aug 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Melbourne, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of General Surgery
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street Rm 10EN-212
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 5336
Fax: (416) 340-3808
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carol-Anne Moulton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 1 2018


Corporation Name: Carol-Anne Moulton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Moulton ( CPSO# 79865 )

Business Address:
Department of General Surgery
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street Rm 10EN-212A
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 31 Aug 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 23 Sep 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 24 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Aug 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Nov 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2012 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Carole-Anne Evelyn Moulton may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        University of Toronto, in which Dr. Moulton holds an academic
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Moulton no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.