Moulton, Richard (CPSO#: 20654)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1971 CFPC Specialist
Neurosurgery Effective: 27 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993