Mounsey, Robert Arundel (CPSO#: 59636)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
520 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1R 0B1
Phone: (416) 673-9393
Fax: (416) 673-9394
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Mounsey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rutherford ( CPSO# 73569 )
Dr. R. Mounsey ( CPSO# 59636 )

Business Address:
401 - 520 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1R 0B1
Phone Number: (416) 673-9393

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 02 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT ARUNDEL MOUNSEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUNSEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1989