Mountjoy, Jeremi Richard (CPSO#: 84862)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Please contact the hospital where care was provided for medical record inquiries.
Date Received: 25 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 23 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015