Mountjoy, Margo Lynn (CPSO#: 56951)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Medical School
Waterloo Regional Campus
10-B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Phone: 519-885-5426 Ext. 21122
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health and Performance Clinic
University of Guelph
50 Stone Road East
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Canada
Phone: (519) 767-5011 Ext. 3207
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Margo Mountjoy and Dr. Kevin Samson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Samson ( CPSO# 56962 )
Dr. M. Mountjoy ( CPSO# 56951 )

Business Address:
University of Guelph
Health and Performance Clinic
50 Stone Road East
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Phone Number: (226) 971-2940

Business Address:
A - 175 Alma Street
Box 340
Rockwood ON  N0B 2K0
Phone Number: (519) 856-4681

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGO LYNN MOUNTJOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUNTJOY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1987