Mourad, Ophyr (CPSO#: 70440)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Room 4 - 151 Cardinal Carter
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 5541
Fax: (416) 864-5714
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lovinsky-Mourad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Mourad ( CPSO# 70440 )
Dr. R. Lovinsky ( CPSO# 71350 )

Business Address:
St. Michaels Hospital
Unit 4-151 CC
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5541

Business Address:
Scarborough Hospital
General Division
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OPHYR MOURAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOURAD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000