Moussa, Bassem Gamal Fahmy (CPSO#: 85155)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centr
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Lakeridge Health, Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: 905-576-8711
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bassem Moussa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Moussa ( CPSO# 85155 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BASSEM GAMAL FAHMY MOUSSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUSSA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 23 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2006 to 28 Feb 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 20 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009