Mousset, Xavier Rene (CPSO#: 61907)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Feb 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 1990

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
600 MICHAEL DEBAKEY DR
Lake Charles LA  70601
United States
Phone: (337) 439-5800
Fax: (333) 439-0003

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Louisiana

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. XAVIER RENE MOUSSET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUSSET is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1990

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On September 24, 2013, at the 14th Judicial District Court in Lake Charles, Louisiana a finding of malpractice was made against Dr. Xavier Rene Mousset in respect of an incident that took place in February 2005.