Moustarah, Fady (CPSO#: 71542)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Oct 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
912 S. Washington Ave, Suite 1
Saginaw MI  48601
United States
Phone: (989) 980-4995

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Lebanon
USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FADY MOUSTARAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUSTARAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2002