Mouzaki, Marialena (CPSO#: 91582)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek, Spanish

Education:National and Capodistrias Univ of Athens, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 25 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 25 Jan 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Oct 2014
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017