Mowbray, David Nicholas (CPSO#: 51261)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015