Moyal, Yoel (CPSO#: 77002)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chesley Medical Clinic
39-2nd Street S.E.
Chesley ON  N0G 1L0
Phone: (519) 363-3220
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yoel Moyal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Moyal ( CPSO# 77002 )

Business Address:
SBGH Chesley Hospital
39 2nd Street South East
Chesley ON  N0G 1L0
Phone Number: (519) 363-2340

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Aug 2000 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YOEL MOYAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOYAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2001