Moyo, Margaret Sifuma (CPSO#: 68651)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jan 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Mar 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Nairobi, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 9
695 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7J9
Phone: (519) 620-9444
Fax: (519) 620-0450
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Margaret S. Moyo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Moyo ( CPSO# 68651 )

Business Address:
9 - 695 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7J9
Phone Number: (519) 620-9444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 Dec 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET SIFUMA MOYO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOYO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Sep 1995
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1995