Mozarowski, Paul Thomas (CPSO#: 51876)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospitals
750 Great Northern Rd.
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3680
Fax: (705) 759-3695
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Mozarowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mozarowski ( CPSO# 51876 )

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospitals
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 09 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL THOMAS MOZAROWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOZAROWSKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1983