Mrad, Mohamed Amir Ahmad Mazen S (CPSO#: 82872)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Plastic Surgery
2075 Bayview Avenue M1 525
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4868
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ajmal Clinic
Dhabab Street
Riyadh 12314
Saudi Arabia
Saudi Arabia
Phone: +966505213186
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMED AMIR AHMAD MAZEN S MRAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MRAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Jun 2005 to 01 Aug 2005
PEAP - Resident - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 02 Aug 2005 to 01 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 02 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010