Mrkobrada, Marko (CPSO#: 82849)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Campus
Department of Internal Medicine
P O Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 33170
Fax: (519) 663-3414
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Mrkobrada Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 29 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mrkobrada ( CPSO# 82849 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Campus
Department of Internal Medicine
B9-100
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3170

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARKO MRKOBRADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MRKOBRADA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009