Mroz, Krzysztof (CPSO#: 51220)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Nov 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Polish, Spanish

Education:Slaska Academy of Medicine, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Mroz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 24 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 23 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Nov 2013

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: November 30, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Mroz has resigned from the practice of medicine, effective November 30, 2013.