Muckle, Thomas James (CPSO#: 30651)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Mar 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Mar 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Durham, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 29 Mar 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Mar 2005

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: January 17, 2005
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On January 18, 2005, the College withdrew the allegations against Dr. Muckle.

On January 17, 2005 Dr. Thomas James Muckle signed an Undertaking with the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario stating:

1. I understand that, as a result of the report dated November 7, 2004 and the reports dated
November 16 and December 23, 2004, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the
“CPSO”) is concerned about my competence in the areas of pain management and lipidology,
and that the CPSO is concerned about protecting the public.

Resignation

I, DR. MUCKLE:

2. Hereby resign from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March
1, 2005.

3. Undertake to execute the “Resignation of Membership” form, which is attached as
Schedule A to this Undertaking, and to return the same to the CPSO forthwith.

4. Undertake and agree not to apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to
practise medicine in any jurisdiction.

5. Effective immediately, undertake to cease to accept any new patients.

6. Undertake to advise all of my patients and physicians who refer patients to me of my
retirement from practice as of March 1, 2005 forthwith.

Narcotics and Acetaminophen

I, DR. MUCKLE, undertake as follows:

7. Effective immediately, to permanently cease to prescribe any narcotics, controlled
substances and acetaminophen.

8. To execute the “Voluntary Resignation of Prescribing Privileges Form”, which is
attached as Schedule B to this Undertaking, and to return the same to the CPSO forthwith.

Rothbart Pain Clinic

I, DR. MUCKLE, undertake as follows:

9. Effective immediately, to cease to treat any patients at the Rothbart Pain Clinic.

10. Effective immediately, to permanently cease to perform trigger point injections and
peripheral block procedures, including paravertebral (cervical, thoracic and lumbar), occipital
nerve, temporal nerve, transcapular, anterior accessory and sacrospinatous block procedures.

11. To see any of my existing patients who are scheduled to attend upon me between January
18 and February 28, 2005 once, and only for the purposes of referring them to an appropriate
specialist or back to their family physician.

12. To prepare medical legal reports and consultation reports for each of these patients, as
required.

Lipids Practice

I, DR. MUCKLE, undertake as follows:

13. Effective immediately, to cease to treat any patients in my lipids practices, with the
exception of taking any steps necessary to maintain a patient’s current treatment plan if their care
has not yet been assumed by another physician. This would include mandatory investigations
such as blood work or referral for stress tests, referral to other consultants as required and the
renewal of medications required to bridge care.

14. To see any of my existing patients who are scheduled to attend upon me between January
18 and February 28, 2005 once, and only for the purposes of referring them to an appropriate
specialist or back to their family physician.

15. To write a final consultation report for each of the patients in my lipids practice.

Monitoring and Enforcement

I, DR. MUCKLE, undertake as follows:

16. To submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my office(s), practice(s)
and patient charts by a CPSO representative for the purposes of monitoring and enforcing my
compliance with the terms of this undertaking.

General Terms

17. I, DR. MUCKLE, understand and agree that a breach of this undertaking constitutes
professional misconduct, and that a copy of the undertaking can be filed by the CPSO at a
discipline hearing concerning any such breach.

18. I, DR. MUCKLE, consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered in the register as
information that is available to the public.