Mucsi, Istvan (CPSO#: 67721)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Apr 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 06 Apr 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian

Education:Medical University of Semmelweis, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Dept of Nephrology
585 University Avenue
Suite 11PMB 188
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4084
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 10 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ISTVAN MUCSI may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF MEDICINE, DIVISION OF NEPHROLOGY, UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO in which Dr. MUCSI holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. MUCSI may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. MUCSI no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. MUCSI no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. MUCSI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 May 1995
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 May 1996
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 May 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 May 1996
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2016