Mudrik, Kevin Paul (CPSO#: 67359)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnbrook Hospital
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 7722
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K.P. Mudrik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mudrik ( CPSO# 67359 )

Business Address:
380 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 29 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN PAUL MUDRIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUDRIK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Sep 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2010
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2017