Mueller, Dagmar Lydia (CPSO#: 75596)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 22 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Sep 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Oct 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Dec 2008