Mueller, Edrise Morici (CPSO#: 71884)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: Lobo, Edrise Morici (used until: 05 Jul 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 05 Dec 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 06 Dec 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012