Mueller, Valerie Margaret Laidlaw (CPSO#: 67803)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 837-6440
Fax: (519) 837-6426
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

18 Pine St
Kitchener ON  N2H5Z8
Canada
Phone: 519 570 3660
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. Mueller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Mueller ( CPSO# 67803 )

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 03 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VALERIE MARGARET LAIDLAW MUELLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUELLER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Sep 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 06 Nov 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 07 Nov 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2003